Financial history Lancashire Mining Museum Limited

Charity number: 513511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £73.62k £123.08k £154.80k £168.81k £137.94k
Total expenditure £70.71k £70.02k £138.82k £141.39k £122.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A