Financial history SOBERTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1184016
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £21.76k £18.25k £19.05k £18.71k £15.54k
Total expenditure £15.41k £17.10k £12.00k £12.89k £16.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.33k £8.57k N/A N/A