Financial history JAMES PEACOCK'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 513594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £5.97k £6.68k £7.09k £9.42k £9.06k
Total expenditure £10.97k £5.33k £4.58k £8.76k £8.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A