65 DEGREES NORTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
65 Degrees North works with Wounded, Injured or Sick veterans or service people in order to provide a measure of Rehabilitation through Adventure
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aston Woodward | Chair | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Stephen Wake | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Blackburn | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Hugh Parsons | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Anne Louise Markey MRCS, MD | Trustee | 18 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £186.25k | £1.98k | £195.34k | £11.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.43k | £25.71k | £124.32k | £159.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF WOUNDED, INJURED AND SICK SERVING OR FORMER ARMED FORCES PERSONNEL (‘THE BENEFICIARIES’) BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY EMPOWERING, ENGAGING AND INSPIRING THE DISABLED AND DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, DEVELOPMENT AND ASSISTANCE TO THE BENEFICIARIES ENABLING THEM TO TAKE PART IN CHALLENGING EXPEDITIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Walter Hunter & Co
24 Bridge Street
NEWPORT
Gwent
NP20 4SF
- Phone:
- 07549887539
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window