THE FRIENDS OF PLATT FIELDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities to further the objectives of the charity. This includes campaigning, fundraising, working with partners including the local authority, and spending on events, gardening, and encouraging volunteer activity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Manchester City
Governance
- 25 February 2019: CIO registration
- 06 November 2024: Funds received from 1086533 THE FRIENDS OF PLATT FIELDS
- FRIENDS OF PLATT FIELDS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNE TUCKER | Trustee | 27 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Allan Challenger | Trustee | 27 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kattie Kincaid | Trustee | 27 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Victor Neesham | Trustee | 27 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prof William Stuart Turley | Trustee | 27 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rashid Mhar | Trustee | 27 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel James Thomson | Trustee | 25 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
George Sanders | Trustee | 25 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jean Griffin | Trustee | 25 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £4.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £10.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2022 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 May 2022 | 192 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 March 2022 | 508 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 May 2022 | 557 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 25 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION, RESTORATION, MAINTENANCE, AND IMPROVEMENT OF PLATT FIELDS PARK, AND TO ENCOURAGE BOTH A GREATER USE BY THE PUBLIC OF THE FACILITIES AVAILABLE AND HIGH STANDARDS IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH FACILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LAKESIDE CENTRE
PLATT FIELDS PARK
MANCHESTER
M14 6LA
- Phone:
- 01612242902
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window