CITY OF SHEFFIELD ROWING CLUB

Charity number: 1182522
Charity reporting is up to date (102 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

City of Sheffield Rowing Club promotes community participation in healthy recreation for the public benefit in and around the city of Sheffield, through the provision of facilities for rowing and sculling.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £54,724
Total expenditure: £38,042

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 March 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Joseph Hogley Trustee 16 March 2023
None on record
Drew Stephen McLaughlin Trustee 16 March 2023
None on record
Simon James Coyne Trustee 24 March 2022
None on record
RICHARD SELBY Trustee 24 March 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £53.81k £25.83k £59.67k £49.64k £54.72k
Total expenditure £25.71k £16.72k £47.52k £40.72k £38.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 November 2024 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 10 February 2025 102 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 23 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 23 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
15 WESTBROOK BANK
SHEFFIELD
S11 8YJ
Phone:
07813324692