Financial history BLANCHLAND VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1184203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £16.28k £10.96k £15.90k £9.12k £15.21k
Total expenditure £8.81k £4.68k £13.00k £23.28k £18.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £9.33k £6.67k N/A N/A