WILLOWS COUNSELLING SERVICE

Charity number: 1185304
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide a counselling service for adults To provide counselling training courses To distribute information to individuals and agencies. To support churches on pastoral care issues. To undertake occasional research. To work collaboratively with other agencies

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £236,023
Total expenditure: £247,023

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Swindon
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 September 2019: CIO registration
  • 09 December 2021: Funds received from 1037677 WILLOWS COUNSELLING SERVICE
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip Leslie Blunt Trustee 10 December 2024
None on record
Gregory Kingsley Pirt Trustee 05 November 2024
None on record
Fiona Rosetta Prinzi Trustee 26 March 2024
None on record
Catherine Forty Trustee 08 March 2022
None on record
Tanya Lowe Trustee 06 November 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £995.95k £168.92k £163.11k £176.18k £236.02k
Total expenditure £181.39k £225.38k £194.64k £224.90k £247.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £32.51k £3.55k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £171.72k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £44.23k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £3.17k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £15.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £11.26k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £765.58k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £15.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £181.30k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £96 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £3.11k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 10 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 10 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 05 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 05 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 16 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 16 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 22 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 16 August 2021 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 16 August 2021 47 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WILLOWS COUNSELLING SERVICE
THE WILLOWS CENTRE
11 PROSPECT PLACE
SWINDON
SN1 3LQ
Phone:
01793426650