GATEWAY STUDIO CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in the Arts, in particular the art of dance, by the provision of accessible dance education and teaching and ancillary activities, and the presentation of public performances and other similar activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gateshead
Governance
- 04 December 2019: CIO registration
- GATEWAY STUDIO PROJECT CIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeffrey Martin Dean | Chair | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD LYNCH | Trustee | 29 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Derrick | Trustee | 29 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Akosua Boakye Bem | Trustee | 29 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Ann Cruise | Trustee | 29 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kema Sikazwe | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Farrington | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Hogarth | Trustee | 17 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Jane Miller | Trustee | 17 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Huggins MBE, FRSA | Trustee | 17 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £311.44k | £128.51k | £216.36k | £414.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £216.71k | £173.92k | £227.58k | £235.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.29k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 March 2022 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 March 2022 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR THE ART OF DANCE, BY THE PROVISION OF ACCESSIBLE DANCE EDUCATION AND TEACHING AND ANCILLARY ACTIVITIES, AND THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCESAND OTHER SIMILAR ACTIVITIES. TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF GATESHEAD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHERTHE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVINGTHE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS TO PRESERVE, MAINTAIN AND ENHANCE THE TRINITY CENTRE (THE PROPERTY), ITS ENVIRONS AND CONTENTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND THE NATION AT LARGE, AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLICREGARDING THE HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND NATURAL HERITAGE OF THE PROPERTY AND THE CHAPEL OF ST EDMUND, ADJOINING THE PROPERTY, BEING BUILDINGS OF PARTICULAR HISTORICAL AND ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST; AND ANY OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TRINITY CENTRE
HIGH STREET
GATESHEAD
NE8 1EP
- Phone:
- 01914473475
- Email:
- info@gatewaystudio.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window