ALL SAINTS METHODIST CHURCH ABINGDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide premises at All Saints Methodist Church, Abingdon, for regular Christian worship, prayer and reflection Provide premises to organisations supporting young people (e.g. Pre School, and uniformed organisations e.g. Scouts, Brownies, etc), and for other local community groups, at reduced cost or for free Provide pastoral support to Church members and others Raise funds for good causes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
44 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 26 June 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Martin Appleyard | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Georgina Felicia Bondzi-Simpson MBE | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Gareth Anthony Hawkes | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Tyrell | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Williams | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Ida Roche | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Richard Matthews LLB | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Mary Pooley | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Keith Underhill | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Batey | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Butler | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ann Hoskins | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Fleur Phipps | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Judith Penrose Brown | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Appleyard | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Deacon Selina Nisbett | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ellwood | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Russell | Trustee | 30 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Derek Pooley | Trustee | 30 October 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.80k | £88.25k | £83.51k | £93.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.19k | £70.06k | £81.99k | £84.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 07 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints Methodist Church
Appleford Drive
Abingdon
OX14 2AQ
- Phone:
- 07894839586
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window