Financial history THE DEVONSHIRE AND DORSET REGIMENTAL TRUST

Charity number: 1183992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £24.60k £17.00k £23.18k £23.15k £30.77k
Total expenditure £46.16k £51.00k £62.31k £55.47k £60.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A