THE KAFUE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Kafue Foundation's mission is to advance conservation and community initiatives across the Kafue National Park, Zambia. We aim to empower existing initiatives that operate within the Kafue. We will be partnering with leading and emerging conservationists to protect endangered species, develop sustainable solutions & reduce human-wildlife conflict and work with local communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
People

2 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Zambia
Governance
- 08 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Olivia Carnegie-Brown OLY | Trustee | 08 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Barnes | Trustee | 08 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 200 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 200 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 566 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 566 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 931 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 931 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 July 2022 | 261 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 July 2022 | 261 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO ("THE OBJECT") IS TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE KAFUE NATIONAL PARK, ZAMBIA AND THE PROTECTED AND ENDANGERED SPECIES THEREIN IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO SUPPORT NEW AND EXISTING INITIATIVES THAT: • COUNTER ILLEGAL POACHING; • TRAIN AND HIRE PARK RANGERS; • EDUCATE LOCAL COMMUNITIES; • RESEARCH METHODS TO IMPROVE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF THE KAFUE NATIONAL PARK’S ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Lamtarra Way
NEWBURY
RG14 7WB
- Phone:
- 07850189509
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window