Financial history PEMBROKESHIRE COUNSELLING SERVICE

Charity number: 1183359
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/04/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £42.77k £25.92k £111.80k £46.99k
Total expenditure £0 £24.66k £22.14k £33.21k £54.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.50k £23.42k £29.43k £44.18k