Trustees BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR IMMEDIATE CARE
Charity number: 1188273

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL JOHN GATES | Chair | 14 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Clare Fitchett | Trustee | 08 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Adam Waller | Trustee | 08 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ben Brown | Trustee | 08 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Suzannah Hoult | Trustee | 08 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Matt Ward | Trustee | 08 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jon Barratt | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Alison Leary MBE | Trustee | 22 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr RICHARD STEPHEN STEYN | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew James Pountney | Trustee | 09 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rowland Lovat Cottingham | Trustee | 09 October 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.