Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST, FARSLEY
Charity number: 1185811

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Gareth Howles | Chair | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Glover | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Saxton | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Val Bergin | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Howard Bradley | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joel Isaacson | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jill Mulligan | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Sykes | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Tuke | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Sheller | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Walker | Trustee | 01 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Janet Whitaker | Trustee | 01 April 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.