CAMBRIDGE GIRLS CHESS INITIATIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Cambridge Girls Chess Initiative (CGCI) encourages young girls to play more chess. CGCI offers nine training sessions per year (three sessions per school term), on Sunday afternoons, at three levels, beginners, intermediate and advanced. CGCI also participates at the Cambridge Chess Championship with a girls-only team.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 July 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 10 December 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Elisa Faraglia | Trustee | 10 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Professor Mette Eilstrup-Sangiovanni | Trustee | 10 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Chrysi Giannitsarou | Trustee | 10 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
KERRY CARTER COX | Trustee | 10 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/07/2020 | 30/07/2021 | 30/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £505 | £0 | £50 | |
|
Total expenditure | £886 | £20 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 341 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 341 days | |
Annual return | 30 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 July 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 July 2020 | 30 March 2022 | 304 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2020 | 30 March 2022 | 304 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE TEACHING DEVELOPMENT AND SUPERVISION OF THE PLAYING OF CHESS AMONGST SCHOOL AGE GIRLS IN CAMBRIDGE SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jollyboys
Bakers Lane
Felsted
DUNMOW
Essex
CM6 3LP
- Phone:
- 01371 823162
- Email:
- cam.girls.chess@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window