Trustees NATURAL SCIENCES COLLECTIONS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1186918

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Stacey Gallichan | Chair | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emilie Pearson | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Claire Jones | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eimear Ashe | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Booth-Downs | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Murphy | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annabelle Buchanan-Smith | Trustee | 31 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patti Wood Finkle | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tannis Davidson | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Alexis McCoy | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Glenn James Roadley | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jack Daniel David Ashby | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Clare Mary Brown BSc MSc | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Isla Sophie Gladstone | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
YVETTE BERENICE HARVEY | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.