BRITISH LIMB RECONSTRUCTION SOCIETY -BLRS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing limb reconstruction services in the NHS through research, audit, training and education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 February 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON BRITTEN LLM FRCS | Chair | 26 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Phillips | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
PETER ROBERT CALDER FRCS | Trustee | 26 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK FOSTER FRCS | Trustee | 26 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £131.68k | £19.11k | £14.28k | £26.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.67k | £9.75k | £37.50k | £59.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 09 January 2025 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 09 January 2025 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 29 January 2024 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 29 January 2024 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 28 March 2023 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 28 March 2023 | 90 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 28 March 2023 | 455 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 28 March 2023 | 455 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE BLRS ARE TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL HEALTH OF PATIENTS REQUIRING LIMB RECONSTRUCTION FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT BY - ADVANCING LIMB RECONSTRUCTION SERVICES IN THE NHS THROUGH RESEARCH, AUDIT, TRAINING AND EDUCATION. O PROMOTING LIMB RECONSTRUCTION TECHNIQUES TO ALL ORTHOPAEDIC AND PLASTIC SURGICAL TRAINEES, LIMB RECONSTRUCTION SURGEONS (LRSS) AND ALLIED HEALTH PROFESSIONALS (AHPS) IN UNITED KINGDOM. - RAISING AWARENESS OF NEW TECHNIQUES IN THE TREATMENT OF PATIENTS OF ALL AGES WITH COMPLEX LIMB PROBLEMS INCLUDING CHILDREN WITH CONGENITAL (INBORN) LIMB DEFORMITIES AND DEFICIENCIES, BONE INFECTIONS, LIMB SHORTENING AND DEFORMITIES, NON-HEALING FRACTURES ETC. - AIDING WITH SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH MAY BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND RELATED TO THE ACQUISITION OF KNOWLEDGE AND SKILLS IN LIMB RECONSTRUCTION AS SEEN FIT BY THE TRUSTEES. - CREATING A GREATER AWARENESS OF NEW TECHNIQUES IN THE TREATMENT OF PATIENTS OF ALL AGES WITH COMPLEX LIMB PROBLEMS INCLUDING CHILDREN WITH CONGENITAL (INBORN) LIMB DEFORMITIES AND DEFICIENCIES, BONE INFECTIONS, LIMB SHORTENING AND DEFORMITIES, NON-HEALING FRACTURES ETC. - MAKING GRANTS AND AWARDS TO SURGEONS AND AHPS IN RECOGNITION OF ACHIEVEMENTS OR FOR PURSUIT OF ADVANCEMENTS IN LIMB RECONSTRUCTION. - TO AID SUCH PURPOSES WHICH MAY BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WHALES AND RELATED TO THE ACQUISITION OF KNOWLEDGE AND SKILLS IN LIMB RECONSTRUCTION AS SEEN FIT BY TRUSTEES. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE BLRS FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008]
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royal College of Surgeons England
35-43 Lincoln's Inn Fields
LONDON
WC2A 3PE
- Phone:
- 02074061762
- Email:
- n.wainwright@boa.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window