Accounts and annual returns TEWIT YOUTH BAND (HARROGATE)

Charity number: 514676
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 02 July 2024 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 02 July 2024 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 18 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 October 2021 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 November 2020 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 09 November 2020 132 days late Download Open in new window