Financial history TEWIT YOUTH BAND (HARROGATE)

Charity number: 514676
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £28.55k £19.03k £10.24k £60.55k £36.08k
Total expenditure £35.38k £21.20k £16.52k £56.55k £24.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A