TOUR DE MANC CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tour de Manc has no employees and everything is done on a voluntary basis. We provide significant funds for Greater Manchester charities, projects and good causes. Our driving principles are to make a difference to the lives of Manc people, encourage cycling for health and be inclusive.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 June 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Rubins | Chair | 19 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Rogan | Trustee | 19 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr ALASTAIR JONES | Trustee | 19 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Leigh | Trustee | 19 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Franks | Trustee | 19 August 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.99k | £18.90k | £24.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.50k | £23.25k | £25.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 09 JUN 2020
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY; THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES; THE PROMOTION OF CITIZENSHIP, COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION AND DEVELOPMENT IN HEALTHY RECREATION; TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME. IN PARTICULAR BY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE PROVISION OF GRANTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF GREATER MANCHESTER AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Blaze Hill Cottage
Wilmslow Road
Prestbury
MACCLESFIELD
Cheshire
SK10 4LG
- Phone:
- 01618184686
- Email:
- charity@tourdemanc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window