Accounts and annual returns HOSPITALS CHARITY

Charity number: 1185161
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 01 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 01 October 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2021 21 April 2023 295 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 21 April 2023 295 days late
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 November 2021 146 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 23 November 2021 146 days late