FOUNDATION FOR THE FUTURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To develop the capacity and skills of the members of the socially and economically disadvantaged communities within the United Kingdom in such a way that they are better able to identify, and help meet their needs and to participate more fully in society, in particular but not exclusively by providing them with the opportunity to experience working abroad whilst also obtaining qualifications
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Hungary
- Romania
- Slovenia
Governance
- 26 September 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Noel Clare Sharpe | Chair | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Dawn Yates-Obe | Trustee | 30 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Charlotte Norman | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|||||||
Vanessa Toni Barlow | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Atanu Kumar Bhattacherjee | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Sutton | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID JOHN BAGLEY | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £50.00k | £56.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £4.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 February 2021 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 February 2021 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE AGED UP TO THE AGE OF 30 THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES INCLUDING OVERSEAS VOLUNTEERING, WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS 2. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, WORK PLACEMENTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BOLTON AT HOME
98 WATERS MEETING ROAD
BOLTON
BL1 8SW
- Phone:
- 01204329574
- Email:
- CITEAM@boltonathome.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window