BISHOP'S STORTFORD MUSEUM AND ARTS CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Houses a Museum, Auditorium, Meeting Rooms, Dance Studios and cafe/bar area. The complex provides local access to the arts and facilities for a range of cultural activities including dance, theatre, education and cinema.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,117,706
Donations and legacies | £268.18k | |
Charitable activities | £621.53k | |
Other trading activities | £203.06k | |
Investments | £24.94k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,122,853
Raising funds | £103.75k | |
Charitable activities | £1.02m | |
Other | £1.92k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £262,500 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £105.67k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.02m |
People

14 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
49 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 09 June 2020: CIO registration
- 27 June 2024: Funds received from 1090267 RHODES BIRTHPLACE TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Gregory | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Sophie Elizabeth Martin | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Di Falco | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Roger Estop | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Brinklow | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Phillips | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patrick James Brennan | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Pettit | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Steven Connors | Trustee | 05 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Deirdre Glasgow | Trustee | 05 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £5.02m | £998.67k | £1.12m | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £714.65k | £1.02m | £1.12m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £127.50k | £258.01k | £262.50k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £4.48m | £262.04k | £268.18k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £117.91k | £177.92k | £203.06k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £422.70k | £549.94k | £621.53k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £835 | £8.76k | £24.94k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £660.20k | £930.79k | £1.02m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £53.18k | £88.01k | £103.75k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £15.23k | £22.55k | £24.77k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £1.27k | £1.80k | £1.92k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £3.89m | £3.87m | £3.86m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £577.35k | £597.36k | £576.93k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £162.89k | £181.00k | £159.65k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 February 2023 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 February 2023 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO PROMOTE THE PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM, COMMUNITY ARTS CENTRE, THEATRE, CINEMA, ART GALLERY AND LIBRARY. (2) THE PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE COLLECTIONS FORMERLY OF THE BISHOP'S STORTFORD LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY AND THE CECIL RHODES MEMORIAL MUSEUM. (3) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BISHOP'S STORTFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Charity Secretary
Southmill Arts Centre
1-3 South Road
BISHOP'S STORTFORD
Hertfordshire
- Phone:
- 01279 715000
- Email:
- info@southmillarts.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window