Emergency Services Cenotaph

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are raising at least £3.2 million to create the UK's first '999 Cenotaph' dedicated to all who have served in our emergency services and the NHS. It will be built in London and will feature 6 figures - NHS, police, fire, ambulance, maritime and search & rescue, along with a service dog. The 999 Cenotaph will be the UK's national symbol of gratitude, sacrifice and remembrance to our 999 heroes.
What, who, how, where
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Isle Of Man
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 February 2020: CIO registration
- 05 June 2020: Funds received from 1172996 THE NATIONAL EMERGENCY SERVICES MEMORIAL
- 999 CENOTAPH (Working name)
- 999 MEMORIAL (Working name)
- Emergency Services Cenotaph (Working name)
- NATIONAL 999 MEMORIAL (Working name)
- National Emergency Services Memorial (Working name)
- NESM (Working name)
- THE NESM (Working name)
- THE NATIONAL EMERGENCY SERVICES MEMORIAL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Fraser | Chair | 04 February 2020 |
|
|||||||
Wayne Brown | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
William Lingard | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||
William Styles | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Lesley Routh-Jones | Trustee | 23 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 840 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 840 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1205 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1205 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Feb 2020 as amended on 09 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
1. THE PROMOTION OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THROUGH THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A PERMANENT NATIONAL MEMORIAL FOR EMERGENCY SERVICE PERSONNEL IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND WHO HAVE SERVED OR BEEN KILLED IN THE COURSE OF THEIR EMERGENCY SERVICE DUTIES BY HONOURING THEM WITH A NATIONAL MONUMENT TO ACT AS A NATIONAL SYMBOL OF GRATITUDE FOR THEIR SERVICE TO THE CROWN AND PEOPLE OF BRITAIN AND AS A PLACE OF COMMEMORATION. 2. THE PROMOTION OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND THE EFFECTIVENESS AND EFFICIENCY OF THE EMERGENCY SERVICES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY THE PROMOTION OF AN ANNUAL EMERGENCY SERVICES DAY AND ANNUAL EMERGENCY SERVICES FESTIVAL OF THANKSGIVING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND TO ENCOURAGE PEOPLE TO ACT RESPONSIBLY SO AS TO MINIMISE THE RISK OF USING THE EMERGENCY SERVICES AND EMERGENCY SERVICES RESOURCES, AND AS A WAY OF ENCOURAGING THE PUBLIC TO CONSIDER VOLUNTEERING IN A WIDE RANGE OF CAPACITIES SUCH AS SPECIAL CONSTABLES AND NHS COMMUNITY RESPONDERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Hinxhill Road
Willesborough
ASHFORD
Kent
TN24 0ZF
- Phone:
- 07852524076
- Email:
- contact@999cenotaph.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window