CAMROSE CENTRE BASINGSTOKE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Up to 5 days a week, up to 4 hours a day, in a drop in day centre offering; temporary shelter, hot meals, showers, clean clothing, food packs to homeless (rough sleeping, sofa-surfing, B&B) and vulnerably housed people as appropriate. Offering a non-judgemental listening ear and guidance towards improving personal circumstances. Assisting with access to other agencies to improve their situations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 20 March 2020: CIO registration
- CAMROSE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Joseph Sheerin | Chair | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Florence Miles | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Beth Neal | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Baker | Trustee | 18 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL BROWNING | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Cook | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Taylor BSc DPhil | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Baker | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jeannette Welton | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.34k | £65.13k | £131.56k | £92.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.73k | £51.07k | £65.26k | £88.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £21.00k | £18.50k | £18.50k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF HOMELESS PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE AT RISK OF HOMELESSNESS (BY VIRTUE OF BEING VULNERABLY HOUSED) IN BASINGSTOKE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) ESTABLISHING A SHORT TERM CRISIS RELIEF DAY CENTRE PROVIDING SUCH PEOPLE WITH SUPPORT, COMPANIONSHIP, ADVICE, INFORMATION, FOOD, CLOTHING, SLEEPING EQUIPMENT, HAIRCUTS, SHOWERING FACILITIES AND ACCESS TO TELEPHONES AND IT EQUIPMENT FOR THE PURPOSES OF COMMUNICATION; B) RAISING AWARENESS OF HOMELESSNESS IN BASINGSTOKE, ADVOCATING FOR HOMELESS PEOPLE AND THOSE AT RISK OF HOMELESSNESS (BY VIRTUE OF BEING VULNERABLY HOUSED) WITH THE AIM OF BETTER MEETING THEIR NEEDS AND IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS. 2) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING A MEMBER OF A SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
GLEBE HALL
St Michael's Church
Church Square
Basingstoke
RG21 7QW
- Phone:
- 01256320877
- Email:
- info@thecamrosecentre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window