Financial history THE RIPON CITY FESTIVAL TRUST 1986

Charity number: 514981
Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.21k £0 £20.02k £32.69k £50.92k
Total expenditure £4.35k £0 £4.01k £41.72k £37.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £4.00k £4.00k £4.00k