Financial history JACOBS WELL APPEAL

Charity number: 515235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.52m £2.87m £7.21m £84.98k £8.30k
Total expenditure £3.46m £2.80m £7.88m £1.07m £8.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £58.57k £16.52k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £413.11k £2.78m £7.09m N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £12.93k £91.01k £101.27k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £3.10m £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £3.50k £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £19.90k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £220.46k £2.99k £17.32k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.29m £2.65m £7.71m N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £73.37k £65.86k £72.96k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £9.97k £0 £3.71k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £102.79k £91.24k £95.68k N/A N/A