HOPE PREGNANCY ADVICE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running a pregnancy advice and crisis centre, providing advice especially to women who face unplanned pregnancies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ealing
Governance
- 20 December 2019: CIO registration
- 02 April 2024: Funds received from 1154099 FOUNDATION FOR LIFE (SALISBURY)
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FROUKJE CRADOCK | Chair | 13 May 2019 |
|
|||||||||
John Charles Silva | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Marta Randle Douglass Willcox | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Hendrik Lourens Martinus Du Plessis | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.26k | £500 | £42.76k | £13.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £755 | £2.16k | £5.56k | £1.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: A) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF WOMEN & THEIR UNBORN CHILDREN FROM THE POINT OF CONCEPTION AS WELL AS THEIR FAMILIES IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AS SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE IN THE WEST LONDON AREA AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AS SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE TO WOMEN AND THEIR PARTNERS AND FAMILIES WHO ARE EXPERIENCING UNPLANNED OR UNWANTED PREGNANCY OR SUFFERING FROM ANY PHYSICAL OR MENTAL ILLNESS, DISTRESS OR POVERTY DURING OR AS A RESULT OF PREGNANCY OR FOLLOWING ABORTION, MISCARRIAGE, COT DEATH, STILL BIRTH, LOSS OF A CHILD, RAPE OR OTHER SEXUAL ABUSE; C) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AND THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST. D) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE SUBJECT OF PREGNANCY AND THE TERMINATION OF PREGNANCY AND INTO THE EFFECTS THEREOF UPON WOMEN WHETHER PHYSICAL, MEDICAL OR PSYCHOLOGICAL BY A PROVISION OF A SERVICE TO SCHOOLS AND COLLEGES THAT ENCOURAGES AND HELPS YOUNG PEOPLE TO MAKE RESPONSIBLE AND HEALTHY CHOICES WITH REGARD TO THEIR SEXUAL BEHAVIOUR.
Contact information
- Address:
-
INTERNATIONAL PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH
53 DRAYTON GREEN
LONDON
W13 0JE
- Phone:
- 02089974706
- Email:
- hope@hopepregnancyealing.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window