Trustees SUSTAINABLE HOSPITALITY ALLIANCE
Charity number: 1188731

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniella Foster | Chair | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Inge Huijbrechts | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Hugh Worsley | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Denise Naguib | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Bebb Davis | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Farrant | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Susan Hammond | Trustee | 29 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Yasmin Diamond CB | Trustee | 15 December 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.