DEMENTIA MATTERS - HERE (FORDSHIRE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting and facilitating the increase of opportunities for people affected by dementia to live well with their diagnosis and remain a part of their community for as long as possible. Supporting and facilitating facilities to maximise social and recreational opportunities. Raising awareness of the issues affecting people with dementia and their families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 14 January 2020: CIO registration
- 09 January 2024: Funds received from 1173514 LEOMINSTER MEETING CENTRE (LMC)
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SHIRLEY BARBARA EVANS | Chair | 07 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Poole | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Andrew Wood | Trustee | 17 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Cooke | Trustee | 17 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Stuart Pearson | Trustee | 07 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
PHILLIPA MARY BRUCE-KERR | Trustee | 07 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.44k | £134.70k | £153.76k | £139.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.88k | £53.20k | £139.86k | £174.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PEOPLE IN HEREFORDSHIRE, DIAGNOSED WITH DEMENTIA WHO ARE EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF THEIR ILLNESS BY:- · RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES AFFECTING PEOPLE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA AND THEIR FAMILIES, BOTH GENERALLY AND IN RELATION TO THEIR SOCIAL EXCLUSION, BY PROVIDING AND PROMOTING EDUCATION AND INFORMATION; · AWARENESS CAMPAIGNS; WORKSHOPS; FORUMS; AND OTHER EVENTS WHICH WILL ENCOURAGE COMMUNITIES TO BE GENERALLY MORE ACCEPTING OF AND CONFIDENT IN ENGAGEMENT; · SUPPORTING THE DEVELOPMENT OF LOCAL NETWORK GROUPS AND LINKING GROUPS TO ENABLE THEM TO MAKE A MORE EFFECTIVE AND JOINED UP APPROACH; · SUPPORTING THE INCREASE AND COORDINATION OF OPPORTUNITIES FOR PEOPLE AFFECTED BY DEMENTIA TO ENGAGE WITH THEIR COMMUNITIES AND TO ENABLE THOSE COMMUNITIES TO ADAPT SERVICES TO BETTER MEET THEIR NEEDS; AND · SUPPORTING DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FACILITIES AND SERVICES TO MAXIMISE SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES FOR PEOPLE AFFECTED BY DEMENTIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Northern Lights Business Park
Clinton Road
Leominster
Herefordshire
HR6 0SW
- Phone:
- 01432 804480
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window