LETCHWORTH GARDEN CITY AND BALDOCK LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1187474
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide grants to deserving causes within Letchworth, Baldock and Hitchin Area, District and Multiple District Lions Club, Letchworth Garden City and Baldock Lions Club undertakes a number of community service projects.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £8,451
Total expenditure: £9,331

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 January 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Harry Lote Chair 01 July 2020
JACKIE'S DROP IN CENTRE
Received: On time
Paramjit Singh Dev Trustee 01 July 2020
LAWRENCE CLOISTERS TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Kavaljit Kaur Dev Trustee 01 July 2020
LCI MD105 BRAIN TUMOUR AND PAEDIATRIC CANCER FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Sandeep Mansukh Shah Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
David John Upson Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £3.31k £9.16k £13.23k £8.45k
Total expenditure £3.38k £6.27k £7.32k £9.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 04 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 04 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 29 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 29 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 03 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 03 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 17 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 17 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
14 HITCHIN ROAD
LETCHWORTH GARDEN CITY
SG6 3LT
Phone:
03458331406