SELLY PARK SINGERS

Charity Number: 1187669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Selly Park Singers is choir of some 40 members, singing a range of classical, jazz and popular music. It is a non-audition choir. It has weekly rehearsals and performs concerts once or twice a year. We are based in south Birmingham.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £10,406
Total expenditure: £11,487

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 January 2020: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Joan Robinson Trustee 31 March 2025
None on record
Nicola Rogers Trustee 27 August 2024
None on record
Gillian Sarah Langham Trustee 29 April 2024
None on record
Sarah Catherine Mary Wilson Trustee 20 June 2022
None on record
Dr Linda Cullen Trustee 20 June 2022
None on record
Dr Susan Partridge Trustee 31 March 2019
None on record
Jenny Marris Trustee 30 September 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £6.26k £4.52k £5.96k £7.94k £10.41k
Total expenditure £6.93k £5.21k £7.84k £7.78k £11.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 25 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 02 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
28 UPLAND ROAD
SELLY PARK
BIRMINGHAM
B29 7JS
Phone:
+447793525327