THE PATRICK FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The museum consists of a collection of items relevant to the history and heritage of the Patrick Family and Patrick Motors Limited, and associated businesses. The charity receives income from investments & has commenced an educational programme with another local charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 12 October 1984: Standard registration
- 02 October 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Investment
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.51k | £41.16k | £32.15k | £338.49k | £41.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.59k | £72.29k | £308.10k | £316.39k | £120.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 October 2024 | 244 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20 AUGUST 1984
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE MUSEUM FOR THE EXHIBITION TO THE PUBLIC OF THE EXISTING COLLECTION AND SUCH OTHER EXHIBITS OR ITEMS ASSOCIATED WITH TRANSPORT OVER THE YEARS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE COMPRISED IN THE TRUST FUND AND TO PRESERVE THE SAME AS A COLLECTION. (SEE DEED FOR FURTHER DETAILS).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window