Financial history ANIMAL WELFARE (FURNESS)

Charity Number: 1189973
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £949.86k £203.04k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £206.63k £244.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £813.29k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £129.81k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £6.76k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £115.12k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £36.22k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £170.42k N/A