THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DRAYTON BASSETT, FAZELEY AND MILE OAK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities and provision of space to be hired by non religious groups
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
72 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 01 September 2020: Standard registration
- PEEL PARISHES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hazel Marie Plant | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Guy Edwards | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Steven Croft | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark James Hardy | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Margaret Passey | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Alexander Sinclare Keen | Trustee | 26 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Yvonne Andrews | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Dawn Rammell-Sime | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judith Anne Haden-Homer | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Smith | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Howard Thornley | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Jean Jennings | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judith Mary Davies | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Gail Jackson | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £108.14k | £119.59k | £129.17k | £142.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.36k | £141.58k | £134.24k | £154.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 11 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PEEL PARISHES OFFICE
COLESHILL STREET
FAZELEY
TAMWORTH
B78 3RQ
- Phone:
- 01827289414
- Email:
- admin@peelparishes.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window