Trustees THE LINE ART WALK
Charity number: 1190073

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Henry Thomas Price | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Amanda Louise Chambers | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Kador | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Caroline Barty | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diana Mary Frances Spiegelberg | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Farrah Washash | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jacek Ludwig Scarso | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Siladevi Chawda | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Navjot Mangat | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michele Jean Faull | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Howard Dawber | Trustee | 08 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ivan William Harbour | Trustee | 08 January 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.