IMPRINT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sunday worship, midweek small groups, worship nights. Outreach and educational activities such as social events and conferences. Creating Christian films, drama productions and music. Activities catering to the youth and children, and pastoral care for those in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 May 2020: CIO registration
- IMPRINT CHURCH (Working name)
- IMPRINT CHURCH LEICESTER (Working name)
- IMPRINT CHURCH LONDON (Working name)
- IMPRINT LONDON (Working name)
- IMPRINT MUSIC (Working name)
- IMPRINT SOUND (Working name)
- IMPRINT WORSHIP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adewole Agbaje Mr | Chair | 04 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dario Lucas Martini | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Dhar | Trustee | 15 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Pedro Neto | Trustee | 14 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kudakwashe Charmaine Marufu | Trustee | 31 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shammah Agbaje | Trustee | 04 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Benita Thambipillai | Trustee | 04 May 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/11/2021 | 03/11/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125.67k | £188.29k | £95.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £119.59k | £112.27k | £128.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 November 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 November 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 November 2021 | 24 November 2022 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 November 2021 | 24 November 2022 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 May 2020 as amended on 11 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
The objects of the CIO are: - To advance the Christian faith in the UK and worldwide for the public benefit, primarily but not exclusively by means of providing a place of worship, religious education, producing and promoting media such as religious books, music, literature or films. - Providing pastoral care in the community and the relief of any person who is in charitable need.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Edmund the King
57 -59 Lombard Street
London
EC3V 9EA
- Phone:
- 020 7726 4878
- Email:
- info@imprintlondon.co.uk
- Website:
-
weareimprint.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window