Trustees CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF FUNDRAISING
Charity number: 1188764

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harpreet Kaur Kondel | Chair | 12 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Monwara Shanti Ali | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Damian Craig Chapman | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jordan Daniel Miller-Hughes | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Rae Tait | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Germaine Solange Rand | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gary William Kernahan | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Parkes | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Mansell | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Sofia Zeenat Sheikh | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.