STEP UP MCR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Step Up MCR is a grant making organisation that supports a range of Charitable Activities that support the five ways to wellbeing. We support community development, and local giving that helps people Connect, Be Active, Take Notice, Keep Learning and to Give. We provide services to support more impactful and collaborative giving to meet the needs of the communities we work with.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Manchester City
Governance
- 28 September 2020: Standard registration
- STEP UP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christos Kottis | Trustee | 09 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dave Knott | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yasmin Amelia Clarke | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Joseph Frederick Woodcock | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Martin | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paula Turner | Trustee | 11 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Scott Vandeventer | Trustee | 25 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.96k | £129.90k | £125.06k | £130.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £697 | £89.94k | £124.81k | £113.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
3.1 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE AREA OF BENEFIT, INCLUDING: 3.1.1 THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF URBAN REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND SURROUNDING AREAS) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS; 3.1.1.1 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; 3.1.1.2 THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT; 3.1.1.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY OF UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; 3.1.1.4 THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY OR OTHER CHARITABLE HELP IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP:-(I) TO ENABLE PEOPLE TO SET UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS OR (II) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES; 3.1.1.5 THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKPLACE, BUILDING AND / OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; 3.1.1.6 THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; 3.1.1.7 THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; 3.1.1.8 THE PROVISION OF OFFICE AND MEETING SPACE FOR NON-PROFIT MAKING ORGANISATIONS AND INDIVIDUALS; AND 3.1.1.9 SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION FOR ENGLAND AND WALES. 3.1.2 THE DEVELOPMENT OF CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF MEMBERS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND SURROUNDING AREAS IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; AND 3.1.3 THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE WHO ARE SOCIAL EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY (AND FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING A MEMBER OF A SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Resonance Centre
The Old School House
Clayton Street
Manchester
M11 4EA
- Phone:
- 07584556989
- Email:
- hello@stepupmcr.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window