Accounts and annual returns LLANDUDNO MUSEUM AND GALLERY

Charity Number: 1188826
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 06 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 August 2024 213 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 August 2024 213 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 February 2023 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 15 February 2023 15 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 12 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window