Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE A453 CHURCHES OF SOUTH NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
Charity number: 1189059

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev RICHARD COLEMAN | Chair | 01 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Christine Pilnick | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Plimmer | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Erica Turner | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carole Edis | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Julie Moore | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pat Harrison | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sonya Hawkins | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Grocock | Trustee | 19 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angela Howard | Trustee | 16 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Raymond State | Trustee | 16 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Farnsworth | Trustee | 16 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janet State | Trustee | 16 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Smith | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.