EXETER DISPENSARY CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants to the sick and needy of Exeter
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
Governance
- 18 May 2020: CIO registration
- 18 June 2021: Funds received from 205611 EXETER DISPENSARY AND AID-IN-SICKNESS FUND
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angus Martin McNicol | Chair | 30 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Laura Jayne Waycott | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark David Stott | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Vaughan Rosser | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julia Wilson | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
JULIA ANN CHARLES | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin McGahey | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
JEAN HICKEY | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW LEADBETTER | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.08k | £45.05k | £43.99k | £45.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.03k | £41.18k | £41.12k | £50.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 May 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES LIVING IN THE CITY OF EXETER SUFFERING FROM ILLNESS AND/OR LIVING WITH A DISABILITY, BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES NOT PROVIDED BY THE STATE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Wessex Close
Topsham
EXETER
EX3 0LU
- Phone:
- 07980623659
- Email:
- angusmmcnicol@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window