Trustees THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF WRITERS IN EDUCATION
Charity number: 1190424

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derek Neale | Chair | 09 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karina Lickorish Quinn | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Yvonne Kim Battle-Felton | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Moss | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jocelyn Page | Trustee | 03 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Joanna Moore | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Francis Jonathan Gilbert | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Heather Richardson | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Jade Sweetman | Trustee | 09 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Frederick Davidson | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.