Trustees WEST MIDLANDS HISTORIC BUILDINGS TRUST

Charity number: 516158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lewis Thomas Hobbs Trustee 24 May 2023
WEST MIDLANDS HERITAGE TRUST
Recently registered
Hayley Andrews Trustee 01 February 2023
WEST MIDLANDS HERITAGE TRUST
Recently registered
Robin Sellers Trustee 10 January 2019
THE WORCESTERSHIRE BUILDING PRESERVATION TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Wolverhampton Heritage Trust
Received: On time
WEST MIDLANDS HERITAGE TRUST
Recently registered
IAN WILSON Trustee 06 July 2017
THE JOHN MASEFIELD SOCIETY
Received: On time
EDWARD GRAHAM BARRON Trustee 03 November 2016
Wolverhampton Heritage Trust
Received: On time
THE WORCESTERSHIRE BUILDING PRESERVATION TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
WEST MIDLANDS HERITAGE TRUST
Recently registered
NICOLAS CROMBIE Trustee 03 November 2016
None on record
Andrew Foster Trustee 03 November 2016
None on record
Philip Adams Trustee 13 January 2014
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY OLD HILL
Received: On time