Trustees BNJC
Charity number: 1195729

Charity reporting is up to date (289 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marc Louis Sugarman | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Simonson | Trustee | 13 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Yael Breuer | Trustee | 13 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elissa Jo Estrin | Trustee | 13 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Justin Antony Bohm | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
NATASHA RACHEL ISAAC | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL PHILIP DAVIDS | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.