ESSEX HEARING ADVICE SERVICES LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide advice, information, guidance, education and assistance for the relief of people with an acquired hearing loss and who are hard of hearing in Essex, Southend on Sea, Thurrock and the surrounding areas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income includes £53,189 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Essex
- Southend-on-sea
- Thurrock
Governance
- 01 July 2020: Standard registration
- 25 September 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
- 25 September 2024: Funds transferred to 1113498 HEARING HELP ESSEX LIMITED
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.99k | £69.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.36k | £55.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £34.48k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £53.19k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 MAY 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE ADVICE, INFORMATION, GUIDANCE, EDUCATION AND ASSISTANCE FOR THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH AN ACQUIRED HEARING LOSS AND WHO ARE HARD OF HEARING IN ESSEX, SOUTHEND ON SEA, THURROCK AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window