GREAT OAKLEY VILLAGE INSTITUTE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a Village Institute for the use of the inhabitants of Great Oakley without distinction of political, religious or other opinions including use for meetings, lectures, classes and other forms of recreation and leisure time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 29 July 2020: CIO registration
- 02 January 2024: Funds received from 1109690 GREAT OAKLEY VILLAGE INSTITUTE
- GREAT OAKLEY VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TREVOR ANTHONY HAYNES FCILT GCJ | Chair | 29 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROGER VICTOR SKOYLES | Trustee | 29 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Steed | Trustee | 29 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CHRISTOPHER GODBOLD FRSA FCILT | Trustee | 29 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Vivien Watson | Trustee | 29 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Allen Pearson | Trustee | 29 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £14.77k | £27.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £11.68k | £26.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A VILLAGE INSTITUTE FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF GREAT OAKLEY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES, CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1A BROOKE ROAD
GREAT OAKLEY
CORBY
NN18 8HG
- Phone:
- 07774 210933
- Email:
- govillagehall@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window