INCLUSION FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of Inclusion Foundation is to carry on for the benefit of the community the business of providing housing and any associated amenities for persons in necessitous circumstances upon terms appropriate to their means. Our vision is to be a leading Charitable Organisation to provide flexible, innovative housing and service solutions and life opportunities in partnership.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Gibson | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Mary Gomez Balaguer | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Guru Naidoo | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARK DYSON | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £350.00k | £350.00k | £382.00k | £412.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00k | £3.00k | £21.00k | £27.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO CARRY ON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY THE BUSINESS OF PROVIDING HOUSING AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS
Contact information
- Address:
-
INCLUSION HOUSING
106 HEWORTH GREEN
YORK
YO31 7TQ
- Phone:
- 01904675207
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window