Financial history TELFORD MIND

Charity number: 516444
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £120.69k £395.11k £715.86k £637.11k £0
Total expenditure £100.92k £297.85k £553.40k £679.90k £0
Income from government contracts £58.51k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.38k £615.72k £525.01k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £67.26k £18.11k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £648.60k £616.61k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £6 £2.39k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £422.39k £679.51k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £216 £393 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £13.10k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £130.79k £0 N/A